MO HB1444 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Food Production And Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Food Production And Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the confiscation of animals
Title
Changes the laws regarding the confiscation of animals
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 8:30AM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-25 | Hearing Cancelled (S) | |
2012-04-23 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 25, 12:00PM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-19 | Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 036 | |
2012-04-11 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2012-04-11 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-22 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-07 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-31 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred: Emerging Issues in Animal Agriculture (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |