MO HB1443 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits temporary assistance for needy families (TANF) benefit cards from being used at ATMs or to access cash, and limits the items that may be purchased with TANF benefits
Title
Prohibits temporary assistance for needy families (TANF) benefit cards from being used at ATMs or to access cash, and limits the items that may be purchased with TANF benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House: HB 1443 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: HB 1443 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: HB 1443 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: HB 1443 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 107 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: HB 1443 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: HB 1443 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: HB 1443 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 107 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 8:00 a.m., Wednesday, April 4, 2018, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S) |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 100 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-03-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-03-12 | House | Motion to Re-commit to Committee Failed - AYES: 38 NOES: 106 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-03-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-21 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |