MO HB1437 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that only one license plate be issued for all motor vehicles, except those with personalized plates, instead of the current two plates
Title
Requires that only one license plate be issued for all motor vehicles, except those with personalized plates, instead of the current two plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred: Spec Stand Com on Infrastructure & Trans Fund (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-18 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1437&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1437I.htm |