MO HB1436 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to petroleum storage tanks
Title
Modifies provisions relating to petroleum storage tanks
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Knight [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |