MO HB1436 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Referred: Spec Stand Com on Infrastructure & Trans Fund (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Referred: Spec Stand Com on Infrastructure & Trans Fund (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all license plate tabs issued to be printed so that the tab number positively correlates with the license plate or plates issued by the Department of Revenue
Title
Requires all license plate tabs issued to be printed so that the tab number positively correlates with the license plate or plates issued by the Department of Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | Referred: Spec Stand Com on Infrastructure & Trans Fund (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-18 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1436&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1436I.htm |