MO HB1434 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements for public disclosure of financial information of dependent children on financial interest forms.
Title
Modifies requirements for public disclosure of financial information of dependent children on financial interest forms.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Richey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House: HB 1434 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics(S) |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-18 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |