MO HB1431 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits political subdivisions and public school districts from using tax revenue or school funds to purchase alcohol
Title
Prohibits political subdivisions and public school districts from using tax revenue or school funds to purchase alcohol
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Flook [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-18 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1431&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1431I.htm |