MO HB1426 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows any county to create a voluntary registry of persons with health-related ailments to assist those individuals in case of a disaster or emergency
Title
Allows any county to create a voluntary registry of persons with health-related ailments to assist those individuals in case of a disaster or emergency
Sponsors
Rep. John Diehl [R] | Rep. Sue Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-07 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass Consent |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Senate Lounge upon noon recess. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2014-03-05 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2014-03-05 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-03 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2014-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |