MO HB1418 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds corrections officers to the list of persons whose motor vehicle and driver's license records are to be kept confidential.
Title
Adds corrections officers to the list of persons whose motor vehicle and driver's license records are to be kept confidential.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McGirl [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: HB 1418 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-02-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 153 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-18 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |