MO HB1416 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes provisions for religious freedom

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions for religious freedom

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-03-31HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
2021-03-30HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-25HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-03-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-24HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-24HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-10HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-03-04HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2021-03-02HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-03-01HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback