MO HB1415 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows teachers to count hours spent in externships with local businesses as professional development hours

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows teachers to count hours spent in externships with local businesses as professional development hours

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1415 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1415 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1415 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: HB 1415 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-18HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-18HouseEmergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 134 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 133 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseTaken Up
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-15HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-15HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-15HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-15SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2018-05-15SenateEmergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 28 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-15SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 adopted AYES: 29 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-15SenateTaken Up
2018-05-11SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-09SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 11, 2018, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2018-05-08SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-05-08SenateSS Adopted (S) - SA 1, SA 2 adopted
2018-05-08SenateTaken Up
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 1 adopted/SS as amended pending
2018-05-08SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-05-08SenateTaken Up
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-04-30SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-10SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-04-05SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 10, 2018, 1:00pm, SCR 1
2018-03-13SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-08SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 12:00pm, SCR 1
2018-02-21SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Education(S)
2018-02-12HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-08HouseTaken Up
2018-02-07HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-02-07HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To - relating to educational workforce development
2018-02-07HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-01-30HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-29HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-01-24HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-24HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-24HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-10HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Workforce Development(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback