MO HB1411 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to establish an outreach program for historically underserved communities
Title
Requires the Department of Agriculture to establish an outreach program for historically underserved communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |