MO HB1410 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding landlord-tenant actions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding landlord-tenant actions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-09HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-07-09HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-05-13HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-12HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 119 NOES: 22
2014-05-12HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS AS AMENDED AYES: 116 NOES: 23
2014-05-12HouseTaken Up
2014-05-07SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED
2014-05-07SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3 ADOPTED AYES: 32
2014-05-07SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2014-05-07SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-05-07SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2014-05-06SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2014-05-06SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
2014-04-28SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 28, 2014, 8:30pm, Senate Lounge
2014-04-07SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2014-04-07SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 7, 2014, Upon evening recess or adjournment, Senate Lounge
2014-03-27SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2014-03-13HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-13HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 7
2014-03-13HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-03-12HousePerfected (H)
2014-03-12HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2014-03-12HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-02-27HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-02-27HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-02-27HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-20HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-02-20HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-02-11HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-04HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-01-22HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2014-01-15HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-01-14HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback