MO HB1408 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the time period before interest is paid on an overpayment of income tax from four months to 90 days after the last date to file a return, including an extension, or the date the return was filed
Title
Changes the time period before interest is paid on an overpayment of income tax from four months to 90 days after the last date to file a return, including an extension, or the date the return was filed
Sponsors
Rep. Stanley Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-08 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute (S) | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-13 | Conference Committee Substitute (S) | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) | |
2010-05-13 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 0 | |
2010-05-13 | House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute (H) | |
2010-05-13 | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 0 | |
2010-05-12 | Conference Committee Substitute (H) | |
2010-05-12 | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) | |
2010-05-11 | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES SMITH(150), COX, SMITH(14), HOLSMAN AND OXFORD | |
2010-05-10 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS LEMBKE, CUNNINGHAM, RIDGEWAY, CALLAHAN MCKENNA | |
2010-05-10 | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) | |
2010-05-10 | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference | |
2010-05-06 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS | |
2010-05-06 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-06 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-06 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-06 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-05-06 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-05-06 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-05-05 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 6, 2010, 8:00A.M.,SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 | |
2010-04-29 | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S) | |
2010-04-29 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2010-04-29 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-04-29 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-29 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-29 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-26 | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S) | |
2010-04-22 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-21 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-03-24 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-03-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MARCH 24, 2010, 1:30P.M., SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 | |
2010-03-18 | Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means (S) | |
2010-03-04 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-04 | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 24 NOES: 125 | |
2010-03-04 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-03 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Perfected (H) | |
2010-03-02 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-18 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-18 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-17 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred: Tax Reform (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-17 | Prefiled (H) |