MO HB1406 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the offense of animal trespass.
Title
Changes the laws regarding the offense of animal trespass.
Sponsors
Rep. Warren Love [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |