MO HB1400 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates ethics provisions for the city of St. Louis

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates ethics provisions for the city of St. Louis

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-03-10HouseReferred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H)
2021-03-02HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-03-01HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback