MO HB140 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of conservation to give at least one warning before imposing a penalty within the first two years of promulgation of the penalty
Title
Requires the department of conservation to give at least one warning before imposing a penalty within the first two years of promulgation of the penalty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |