MO HB1399 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits contributions to campaigns of city officials for a certain period around bidding for city contracts
Title
Prohibits contributions to campaigns of city officials for a certain period around bidding for city contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |