MO HB1397 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Placed Back on Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits political subdivisions from requiring employers to alter or adjust any employee scheduling unless required by state or federal law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits political subdivisions from requiring employers to alter or adjust any employee scheduling unless required by state or federal law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30HousePlaced Back on Perfection Calendar
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-03-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-28HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-07HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-06HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-30HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-17HouseReferred: Economic Development(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback