MO HB1394 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to covenants not to compete for health care professionals
Title
Modifies provisions relating to covenants not to compete for health care professionals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2023-04-18 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2023-04-12 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2023-03-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H) |
2023-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |