MO HB1394 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H)
Pending: House Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H)
Pending: House Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Natural Resources to implement regulations that comply with the United Nations Framework Convention on Climate Change Paris Agreement
Title
Requires the Department of Natural Resources to implement regulations that comply with the United Nations Framework Convention on Climate Change Paris Agreement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1394&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4522H.01I.pdf |