MO HB1389 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes autocycle operators from protective headgear requirements
Title
Excludes autocycle operators from protective headgear requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House: HB 1389 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-03 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 8, 2018, 8:15am, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-13 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-13 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |