MO HB1383 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding consent for a minor to obtain an abortion

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding consent for a minor to obtain an abortion

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - House: HB 1383 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 113 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: HB 1383 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-03-28SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-26SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 28, 2018, 8:00am, Senate Lounge
2018-03-08SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S)
2018-02-26HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-26HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 113 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-26HouseTaken Up
2018-02-12HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2018-02-07HousePerfected (H)
2018-02-07HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To - relating to parental notification
2018-02-07HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-01-30HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-29HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-01-24HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-23HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-16HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Children and Families(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback