MO HB1378 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces from $200,000 to $75,000 the required annual gross income from the sale of prepared food consumed on the premises that certain restaurant bars must have to obtain a license to sell liquor on Sunday
Title
Reduces from $200,000 to $75,000 the required annual gross income from the sale of prepared food consumed on the premises that certain restaurant bars must have to obtain a license to sell liquor on Sunday
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Salva [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-16 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1378&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1378I.htm |