MO HB1375 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain persons or agencies to request an audit if there is an investigation of an offense of theft or fraud by a public servant or an offense of official misconduct.
Title
Allows certain persons or agencies to request an audit if there is an investigation of an offense of theft or fraud by a public servant or an offense of official misconduct.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |