MO HB1368 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding the Missouri Returning Heroes Education Act
Title
Changes the law regarding the Missouri Returning Heroes Education Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House: HB 1368 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 19, 2018, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans’ and Military Affairs(S) |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2018-03-28 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |