MO HB1359 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Reported to The Senate (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Missouri State Capitol Commission and the Office of Administration to enter into contracts for events held at the State Capitol and the Missouri State Penitentiary historic site

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Missouri State Capitol Commission and the Office of Administration to enter into contracts for events held at the State Capitol and the Missouri State Penitentiary historic site

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-10SenateReported to The Senate (S)
2014-09-10SenatePassed over Veto (G) - AYES: 120 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 1
2014-09-10SenateTaken Up
2014-07-10SenateDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-07-10SenateVetoed by Governor (G)
2014-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-05-06SenateHouse Message (H)
2014-05-06SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 25 NOES: 4
2014-05-06SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-05-01SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2014-04-23SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2014-04-09SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2014-04-02SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2014-04-02SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Senate Committee Room 1, 1:30pm
2014-03-27SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
2014-03-04HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-04HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 1
2014-03-04HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-02-26HousePerfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2014-02-18HouseRules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H)
2014-02-18HouseRules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2014-02-18HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-12HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-02-12HouseReported Do Pass by Consent (H)
2014-02-12HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2014-02-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-12HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-01-28HouseReferred: Special Standing Committee on Corrections(H)
2014-01-15HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-01-14HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback