MO HB1357 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an earned income tax credit in Missouri
Title
Authorizes an earned income tax credit in Missouri
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill Reconsidered (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tax Policy for Working Families(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |