MO HB1355 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows retired police officers to return to work when a disaster or emergency has been proclaimed by the governor or there is a national disaster

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows retired police officers to return to work when a disaster or emergency has been proclaimed by the governor or there is a national disaster

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House: HB 1355 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 133 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: HB 1355 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 138 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: HB 1355 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-01HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-30HouseConstitutional Objection Filed (H)
2018-05-16HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-16HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 1
2018-05-16HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 133 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 1
2018-05-16HouseTaken Up
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-09HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-09SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2018-05-08SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - sa 1, sa 2, sa 3, sa 4, sa 5, sa 6 AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-08SenateTaken Up
2018-05-03SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-03SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-01SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 3, 2018, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room
2018-05-01SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-05-01SenateSS Adopted (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6 adopted
2018-05-01SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-05-01SenateTaken Up
2018-04-30SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-04-05SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-03-29SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-03-15SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-13SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 15, 2018, 8:15am, Senate Lounge
2018-03-01SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
2018-02-21HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-21HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-21HouseTaken Up
2018-02-07HousePerfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2018-01-30HouseReported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-30HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2018-01-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: Consent and House Procedure(H)
2018-01-24HouseReported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-23HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2018-01-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-16HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback