MO HB1355 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows retired police officers to return to work when a disaster or emergency has been proclaimed by the governor or there is a national disaster

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows retired police officers to return to work when a disaster or emergency has been proclaimed by the governor or there is a national disaster

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-03-29SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-03-15SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-13SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 15, 2018, 8:15am, Senate Lounge
2018-03-01SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
2018-02-21HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-21HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-21HouseTaken Up
2018-02-07HousePerfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2018-01-30HouseReported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-30HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2018-01-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: Consent and House Procedure(H)
2018-01-24HouseReported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-23HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2018-01-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-16HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback