MO HB1355 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the governing body of a third or fourth classification county to opt out of state regulations regarding the licensing of child-care facilities and allows the county to adopt its own regulations
Title
Allows the governing body of a third or fourth classification county to opt out of state regulations regarding the licensing of child-care facilities and allows the county to adopt its own regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2014-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1355&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1355I.htm |