MO HB1350 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to criminal history records

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to criminal history records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1350 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1350 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: HB 1350 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: HB 1350 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseSenate Message (S)
2018-05-18HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2018-05-18HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-18HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 132 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2018-05-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-17HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-17HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2018-05-15HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES SMITH(163), CHRISTOFANELLI, CONWAY(104), FRANKS JR., MITTEN
2018-05-15HouseSenate Message (S)
2018-05-15HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - ROWDEN, RIDDLE, WASSON, WALSH, SIFTON
2018-05-15HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2018-05-10HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-10HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - AYES: 145 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
2018-05-10HouseTaken Up
2018-05-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-09HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-09SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2018-05-08SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 AYES: 31 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-08SenateTaken Up
2018-04-05SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-05SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2018-04-04SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 5, 2018, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room
2018-03-14SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) - SA 1, SA 2, SS as amended adopted
2018-03-14SenateSS Adopted (S)
2018-03-14SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-03-14SenateTaken Up
2018-03-08SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-03-07SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-03-07SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-02-26SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, February 28, 2018, 8:00am, Senate Lounge
2018-02-21SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S)
2018-02-12HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-08HouseTaken Up
2018-02-07HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-02-07HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-02-07HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-01-30HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-29HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-17HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-01-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-10HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1350&year=2018&code=R
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4530H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4530H.01P.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4530S.03C.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4530S.05F.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4530H.08S.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4530H.08T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/021.005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/Journals/RDay6605081534-1745.pdf#1563
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/071.003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/077.023.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/077.022.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback