MO HB1348 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows cottage food production operations to sell food over the internet.
Title
Allows cottage food production operations to sell food over the internet.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House: HB 1348 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-18 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 24 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |