MO HB1347 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows home school students to participate in Missouri State High School Activities Association activities for the public school district in which they reside

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows home school students to participate in Missouri State High School Activities Association activities for the public school district in which they reside

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-28HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-04-28HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-04-28HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-04-03HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-04-03HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2014-04-02HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2014-04-02HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-19HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-01-16HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2014-01-15HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-01-14HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback