MO HB1339 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows, rather than requires, the Department of Economic Development to recapture certain tax incentives
Title
Allows, rather than requires, the Department of Economic Development to recapture certain tax incentives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |