MO HB1329 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 adopted/SA 5 to SS for SCS pending
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 adopted/SA 5 to SS for SCS pending
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of public employee retirement plans.
Title
Modifies provisions of public employee retirement plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Remole [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House: HB 1329 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 adopted/SA 5 to SS for SCS pending |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 11, 2018, 12:30pm, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 7, 2018, 10:15am, SCR 1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Health and Pensions(S) |
2018-02-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 6 |
2018-02-19 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to retirement benefits for public employees |
2018-02-13 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |