MO HB1326 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a tax deduction for the costs of firearm training or firearm safety courses
Title
Authorizes a tax deduction for the costs of firearm training or firearm safety courses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |