MO HB1323 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Low-Wage Trap Elimination Act and Sam Pratt's Law and changes the laws regarding child abuse and neglect investigations and unlicensed child care providers
Title
Establishes the Low-Wage Trap Elimination Act and Sam Pratt's Law and changes the laws regarding child abuse and neglect investigations and unlicensed child care providers
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-10 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 000 | |
2012-05-18 | House Concurs (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 145 NOES: 000 | |
2012-05-15 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS | |
2012-05-15 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 01 | |
2012-05-15 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2012-05-10 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-10 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-05-08 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-05-04 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 8, 2012, 9:00 A.M., SCR 1 | |
2012-04-26 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Families (S) | |
2012-04-23 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-19 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 0 | |
2012-04-18 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HSA 1 FOR HA 3 ADOPTED | |
2012-04-18 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-29 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-28 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-22 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred: Children and Families (H) | |
2012-01-18 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |