MO HB1317 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House: HB 1317 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 12:00 pm, Tuesday, April 28, 2020, Joint Committee Room |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-02-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-02-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 adopted |
2020-02-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |