MO HB1300 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires boat title and registration fees collected annually in excess of one million dollars to be deposited in the Water Patrol Division Fund
Title
Requires boat title and registration fees collected annually in excess of one million dollars to be deposited in the Water Patrol Division Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House: HB 1300 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 17, 2018, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 15, 2018, 8:15am, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2018-02-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-02-22 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-20 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 27 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |