MO HB1300 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows fire protection district board of directors to meet without public notice in order to disburse funds necessary for the deployment of certain task forces
Title
Allows fire protection district board of directors to meet without public notice in order to disburse funds necessary for the deployment of certain task forces
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-07 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 30 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass Consent |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 7, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 3 |
2014-03-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-20 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability(H) |
2014-01-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |