MO HB130 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to transportation network companies
Title
Enacts provisions relating to transportation network companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - House: HB 130 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 146 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: HB 130 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 144 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: HB 130 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 140 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: HB 130 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 144 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: HB 130 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 140 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-04-18 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (H) |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-04-13 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-04-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS#2 AYES: 146 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 for SCS |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) - SA 6 withdrawn |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 6, and SS/SCS as amended pending. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 2, SA 4 adopted/ SS/SCS/ as amended pending |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, March 2, 2017, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, February 23, 2017, 8:00am, Senate Lounge |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-01-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2017-01-26 | House | Taken Up |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-01-24 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-01-24 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 1 TO HA 2, HA 2 AS AMENDED ADOPTED |
2017-01-24 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-01-24 | House | Taken Up |
2017-01-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-01-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |