MO HB1286 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to voluntary nonopioid directive forms
Title
Creates provisions relating to voluntary nonopioid directive forms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 2 |
2023-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2023-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |