MO HB1282 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding marriage and replaces marriage licenses with contracts of domestic union
Title
Changes the laws regarding marriage and replaces marriage licenses with contracts of domestic union
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |