MO HB1270 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to log trucks and weight limitations
Title
Modifies provisions relating to log trucks and weight limitations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |