MO HB1267 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the laws by adding virtual institutions to the "Access Missouri Financial Assistance Program"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws by adding virtual institutions to the "Access Missouri Financial Assistance Program"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - House - House: HB 1267 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-03SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-03SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-02SenateExecutive Session Scheduled
2018-05-01SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-04-30SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-10SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-04-05SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 10, 2018, 1:00pm, SCR 1
2018-03-27SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-15SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 27, 2018, 1:00pm, SCR 1
2018-02-21SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Education(S)
2018-02-12HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-12HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-12HouseTaken Up
2018-02-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-08HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-02-08HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-02-07HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-02-07HousePerfected (H)
2018-02-07HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To - relating to online institutions
2018-02-07HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-01-30HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-29HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-25HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-01-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
2018-01-24HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-24HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-17HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-10HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-01-10HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-01-10HousePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Higher Education(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback