MO HB126 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all employers and business entities to enroll and actively participate in a federal work authorization program and imposes stricter penalties for employing an unauthorized alien
Title
Requires all employers and business entities to enroll and actively participate in a federal work authorization program and imposes stricter penalties for employing an unauthorized alien
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations(H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred: Workforce Standards and Development(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB126&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0126I.PDF |