MO HB126 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state to give a prompt written notification to all affected state employees and specified county and city officials in certain situations when the state decides upon a mass layoff
Title
Requires the state to give a prompt written notification to all affected state employees and specified county and city officials in certain situations when the state decides upon a mass layoff
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions (H) | |
2011-01-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB126&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0126I.htm |