MO HB1257 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds provisions relating to in-home licensed child-care facilities.
Title
Adds provisions relating to in-home licensed child-care facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Sara Walsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1257&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3129H.01I.pdf |