MO HB1255 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires children under the age of 18 to be prosecuted for most criminal offenses in juvenile courts unless the child is certified as an adult
Title
Requires children under the age of 18 to be prosecuted for most criminal offenses in juvenile courts unless the child is certified as an adult
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-04-12 | House | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-10 | House | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-03-27 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Judiciary AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-14 | House | Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |